+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (32-14)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (101-33)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {803124/1 Adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - State Personnel – Professional Service – Juvenile Services Education Teachers and Correction Education Teachers
- First Reading Ways and Means
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 7-1101, 8-412, 8-413 - Article - Education
- 9-602, 9-603 - Article - Human Services
- 11-903 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: Third Reading Passed (32-14)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 14
February 24, 2022: Third Reading Passed (101-33)
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 33
February 21, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
January 17, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor