+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-5)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {697074/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-5)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {196187/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 15-109.1 - Article - Health - General
- 5-602 - Article - Health - General
- 5-615 - Article - Health - General
- 5-620 - Article - Health - General
- 5-622 - Article - Health - General
- 5-623 - Article - Health - General
- 15-122.1 - Article - Insurance
- 31-108 - Article - Insurance
- 2-503 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
- 13-1406 - Article - Health - General
- 6-103.1 - Article - Insurance
- 13-406 - Article - Health - General
- 5-619 through 5-623 - Article - Health - General
- 5-624 - Article - Health - General
- 5-625 - Article - Health - General
- 5-626 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 6, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 5
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor