+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (133-3)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {853994/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
- First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 3
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45