+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-2)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Floor Committee Amendment {813827/1 Adopted
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020 - Article - Chapter of the Acts
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (134-2)
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
April 12, 2021: Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 25, 2021: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
March 24, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 12, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor