+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-521 - Article - Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 27, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor