+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {249134/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
249134/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 14-511 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 6, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46