+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 460
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-0)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-301, 2-601 through 2-606 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 14, 2020: Third Reading Passed (128-0)
- Yeas: 128
March 13, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 10, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor