+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (83-55)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {383428/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {282717/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 20, 2017: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 55
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {383428/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 82
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor