+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {794065/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Delegate DeBoy) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {794065/1
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
794065/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-308 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
February 28, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 25, 2013: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor