+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 545961/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
545961/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-209.1 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 14, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139