+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {247677/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {447278/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Lisanti) {793828/1 Adopted
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {396582/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 1, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor