+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (40-6)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-24)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {646387/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
- Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
+ − Amendment
646387/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 6
March 17, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 17, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 14, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 24
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor