+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {294232/1 Report Adopted
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
294232/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 30, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47