+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (41-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {395662/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
395662/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 41
March 30, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 26, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor