+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-24)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {543320/1 Rejected (33-98)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until next session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {950814/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {950814/1
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 16-202 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 24
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {543320/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 98
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor