+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Finance
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-601, 12-605, 12-608 through 12-610, 12-611, 12-612 - Article - Economic Development
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 17, 2022: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
March 16, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
February 17, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor