+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-1)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {796983/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
796983/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-103 - Article - Estates and Trusts
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor