+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1A-27 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor