+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 23-206.2 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2020: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
February 27, 2020: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
February 24, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
January 17, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor