+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden (31-15)
On December 6, 2021 in the House:
- Veto overridden (95-41)
- Motion Special Order vote on veto until next session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Veto Letter
- Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (100-29)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {779338/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (100-31)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {854264/1 Adopted
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
- Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-213 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2021: Third Reading Passed (100-29)
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 29
April 1, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (100-31)
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 31
February 5, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 4, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor