+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Victims of Sexual Abuse – Provision of Services – Technical Correction
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
On April 9, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (126-0)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Victims of Sexual Abuse – Provision of Services – Technical Correction
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Text - First - Victims of Sexual Abuse – Provision of Services – Technical Correction
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-1007, 11-925 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2022: Third Reading Passed (126-0)
- Yeas: 126
March 10, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
February 14, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor