+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {623027/1 Withdrawn
- Favorable with Amendments {959335/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1
- Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 Rejected
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {374469/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 3, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 28, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor