+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 13-3301 through 13-3304 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3305 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3306 through 13-3311 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3307 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3310 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3311 - Article - Health - General
+ − Vote
March 24, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor