+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments 395265/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
395265/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-123 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 12, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor