+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {386885/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
386885/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor