+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {867371/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {236986/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor