+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (105-31)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {983121/1 Adopted (112-19)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {803621/2 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {433727/1 Rejected (45-86)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/6 Rejected (49-82)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/7 Rejected (45-84)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate McKay) {913623/1 Rejected (48-78)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {333725/1 Rejected (51-78)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {183121/1 Rejected (49-81)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {733020/2 Rejected (47-80)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863725/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {823222/2 Rejected (53-79)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {622316/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
- Hearing cancelled
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
- First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (12)
+ − Statutes Amended (52)
- 11-504 - Article - Correctional Services
- 11-604 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-601 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-704 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-705 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-706 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-707 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-708 - Article - Correctional Services
- 6-101 - Article - Correctional Services
- 6-104 - Article - Correctional Services
- 6-111 - Article - Correctional Services
- 6-117 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-101 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-103 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-205 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-301 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-305 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-309 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-401 - Article - Correctional Services
- 7-504 - Article - Correctional Services
- 1-101 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 11-819 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 6-209 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 6-223 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 6-224 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 14-101 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-601 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-601.1 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-607 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-608 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-609 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-609.1 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-612 - Article - Criminal Law
- 7-104 - Article - Criminal Law
- 7-108 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-106 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-206 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-207 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-209 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-301 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-516 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-611 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-801 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-507 - Article - Health - General
- 6-226 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
- 27-101 - Article - Transportation
- 9-402 - Article - Correctional Services
- 3-601 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-602 through 5-606 - Article - Criminal Law
- 5-905 - Article - Criminal Law
- 9-801 through 9-805 - Article - Criminal Law
- 1-601 through 1-605 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (12)
March 31, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 31, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 28, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 31
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (C. Wilson) {983121/1 Adopted
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 19
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folder) {333725/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 78
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folder) {733020/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 80
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {433727/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 86
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {423026/6 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 82
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {423026/7 Rejected
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 84
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (McKay) {913623/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 78
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker) {823222/2 Rejected
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 79
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Carozza) {183121/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 81
+ − Sponsor
Speaker
Type:
Primary Sponsor