+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-7)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted
- Floor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
- Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
February 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 7