+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {995961/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 9.5-401, 9.5-401.1 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
February 17, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor