+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {598675/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {404861/1 Report Adopted
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-525 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 26, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 10, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor