+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor