+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (90-46)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {763924/1 Rejected
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {433725/1 Rejected (43-87)
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {143627/1 Adopted
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Norman) Adopted
- Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Norman) Withdrawn
- Favorable with Amendments {264960/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 14, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 46
March 13, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Norman) {433725/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 87
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor