+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (136-0)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-103 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 27, 2015: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Bromwell) Adopted
- Yeas: 136
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor