+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {366686/1 Report Adopted
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
366686/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 6, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 3, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor