+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-1)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {593427/1 Rejected (13-33)
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
- Favorable
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (128-9)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {690116/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (137-1)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {593427/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 33
March 30, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 27, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 9
March 13, 2015: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (ODonnell) Adopted
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor