+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (119-15)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
- Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted (45-1)
- Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Rejected (5-33)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {564132/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {793522/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {343391/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-207 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 15
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Young) Rejected
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 33
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor