+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {235469/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
235469/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 15, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138