+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {284338/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {350814/1 Report Adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-509 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 1
April 1, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 20, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor