+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments 717079/1
- Special Order until next session (Senator West) Adopted
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable with Amendments 290219/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-134.5 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 12, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor