+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {985163/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
985163/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 23-205 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor