+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-102 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 15, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 12, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor