+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable with Amendments {768775/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
+ − Amendment
768775/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
April 1, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45