+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (123-10)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected (39-91)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {192511/3 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 5-102 - Article - Correctional Services
- 16-204 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 4-101.1 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 5-202 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 5-215 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 10-922 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 2-607 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 9-203 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 2-106 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 4-201 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 5-205 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 9-114 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 9-115 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 9-117 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 9-304 - Article - Criminal Law
- 8-2003 - Article - Natural Resources
- 26-202 - Article - Transportation
- 26-401 - Article - Transportation
- 26-402 - Article - Transportation
- 26-403 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 10
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cardin) {123729/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 91