+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-1)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {893097/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
- Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 1-101, 2-130, 2-132.2, 2-133, 2-140, 2-201, 2-202, 2-203, 2-204, 2-205, 2-206, 2-207, 2-209, 2-210, 2-212, 2-219 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (134-1)
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor