+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-3)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {656689/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
656689/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 3-201 - Article - Estates and Trusts
- 3-203 through 3-208 - Article - Estates and Trusts
- 6-306 - Article - Estates and Trusts
- 7-603 - Article - Estates and Trusts
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor