+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {786086/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
786086/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 18, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140