+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 18-708 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 13, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 130
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor