+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (141-0)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {556387/1 Report Adopted
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
556387/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-503 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 14, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 141
+ − Sponsors (22)
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor