+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-1)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {956682/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
956682/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 16, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor