+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {936681/1 Report Adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
936681/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 21, 2013: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 20, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 131
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor